15670 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVG03353 | KEISHA BIRDSONG | 12/28/2021 | |||||||
LINING QI vs KEISHA BIRDSONG | |||||||||
21CVI03560 | DOUGLAS WM DEYE | 12/28/2021 | |||||||
BARRY HEISMANN vs DOUGLAS WM DEYE | |||||||||
21CVF02970 | DANIEL PURCELL | 12/27/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs DANIEL PURCELL | |||||||||
21CVF02969 | SHELBY Y VAUGHN | 12/27/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs SHELBY Y VAUGHN | |||||||||
21CVF02877 | ERIC M JOSTWORTH | 12/27/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs ERIC M JOSTWORTH | |||||||||
21CVF03362 | CHRISTOPHER K FENNER | 12/27/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs CHRISTOPHER K FENNER | |||||||||
21CVF02371 | ALLEN CLARK | 12/27/2021 | |||||||
PARK A DOING and ERICA H DOING vs ALLEN CLARK | |||||||||
21CVF02919 | CAREY E BRENTLINGER | 12/27/2021 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs CAREY E BRENTLINGER | |||||||||
21CVI02126 | AJS RENOVATING | 12/24/2021 | |||||||
RUCHI MEHTA and ASHISH MANTUI vs AJS RENOVATING | |||||||||
21CVI03587 | AARON M GRUBB | 12/23/2021 | |||||||
TRACY S STATON vs AARON M GRUBB | |||||||||
21CVF03129 | PHILIP PENN II | 12/23/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs PHILIP PENN II | |||||||||
21CVI03318 | JERRY SIMPSON | 12/23/2021 | |||||||
OMAR AL SAMMARI and MOHAMMAD OMAR AL SAMMARI ( A MINOR) vs JERRY SIMPSON | |||||||||
21CVI03557 | SANDY'S TOWING | 12/23/2021 | |||||||
ROBERT FABIAN vs SANDY'S TOWING | |||||||||
21CVH03783 | TIM ADAMS | 12/22/2021 | |||||||
HUMANE SOCIETY OF GREATER DAYTON vs TIM ADAMS | |||||||||
21CVI03425 | MIDAS AUTO SERVICE EXPERTS # 605 | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
ADOLPHE RUSARAZA vs MIDAS AUTO SERVICE EXPERTS # 605 | |||||||||
20CVF03055 | ALISHA D WAGNER | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs ALISHA D WAGNER | |||||||||
21CVG03737 | ANOUSONE T LEUTPHOVA | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
KETTERING ESTATES, LLC vs ANOUSONE T LEUTPHOVA | |||||||||
21CVG03738 | TIFFANY D ATKINS | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
KETTERING ESTATES, LLC vs TIFFANY D ATKINS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 294, 295, 296 ... 782, 783, 784 Next |