15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVG03865 | MELISSA BUTLER | 1/11/2022 | |||||||
BRG REALTY GROUP LLC AGENT FOR ROSELAWN CENTER LP vs MELISSA BUTLER | |||||||||
19CVF03341 | MADELINE S METZGER | 1/11/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs MADELINE S METZGER | |||||||||
21CVL00018 | VAN BUREN VILLAGE APARTMENTS | 1/11/2022 | |||||||
AISSA HAZEL vs VAN BUREN VILLAGE APARTMENTS | |||||||||
21CVG03888 | RAY BARNES | 1/11/2022 | |||||||
HOMESMART REALTY/ MELANATED VISI vs RAY BARNES | |||||||||
21CVI03557 | SANDY'S TOWING | 1/11/2022 | |||||||
ROBERT FABIAN vs SANDY'S TOWING | |||||||||
21CVG03863 | ATSEDE HALL | 1/11/2022 | |||||||
PARKVIEW PLACE LTD vs ATSEDE HALL | |||||||||
20CVF03601 | DUSTYN BANKS AND VICTORIA BEALE | 1/10/2022 | |||||||
CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK APARTMENTS vs DUSTYN BANKS and VICTORIA BEALE | |||||||||
21CVE02642 | HERB GREEN AND JULIANNE BONDER | 1/7/2022 | |||||||
TRACEY B OLEKAS vs HERB GREEN and JULIANNE BONDER | |||||||||
21CVI03318 | JERRY SIMPSON | 1/7/2022 | |||||||
OMAR AL SAMMARI and MOHAMMAD OMAR AL SAMMARI ( A MINOR) vs JERRY SIMPSON | |||||||||
21CVI03416 | JEFF PIERCE AND CAROLE PIERCE | 1/7/2022 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER GOSS vs JEFF PIERCE and CAROLE PIERCE | |||||||||
21CVI03624 | JOSHUA FROWEIN | 1/7/2022 | |||||||
JAMES LIPPINCOTT vs JOSHUA FROWEIN | |||||||||
20CVF02386 | BRUCE M HARNISH | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
G.L. DART GENERAL CONTRACTING IN vs BRUCE M HARNISH | |||||||||
21CVF03256 | TONY D FORD | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs TONY D FORD | |||||||||
21CVF02458 | SHAWN MCDANIEL | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs SHAWN MCDANIEL | |||||||||
21CVI03601 | BUSHRA SHAHID | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
JAMES O'NEIL vs BUSHRA SHAHID | |||||||||
21CVF02919 | CAREY E BRENTLINGER | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs CAREY E BRENTLINGER | |||||||||
21CVF03483 | DANIELLE CLICK | 1/5/2022 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON SUGERY CENTER, LL C/O WILKES LAW FIRM, LLC vs DANIELLE CLICK | |||||||||
21CVF03460 | JEFF J WILLIAMS | 1/5/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JEFF J WILLIAMS | |||||||||
21CVF03454 | MOLLY K BAKER | 1/5/2022 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs MOLLY K BAKER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 286, 287, 288 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |