15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVI02006 | ESHIKA THORNTON | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
NATASHA COX vs ESHIKA THORNTON | |||||||||
22CVI02041 | FIRESTONE | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
APRIL MALLORY vs FIRESTONE | |||||||||
22CVI02042 | BOB ROSS AUTO GROUP MERCEDES BENZ AND DAN PHONG (5... | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
GREGORY JACKSON vs BOB ROSS AUTO GROUP MERCEDES BENZ and DAN PHONG (5... | |||||||||
21CVI03746 | STACEY KOUSE | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
ALEXANDRIA MONTESSORI SCHOOL, IN vs STACEY KOUSE | |||||||||
21CVI03745 | LINDSAY MELVIN | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
ALEXANDRIA MONTESSORI SCHOOL, IN vs LINDSAY MELVIN | |||||||||
21CVI03744 | KORRIN ZISWILER | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
ALEXANDRIA MONTESSORI SCHOOL, IN vs KORRIN ZISWILER | |||||||||
21CVI03747 | JAZZMEN MORGAN | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
ALEXANDRIA MONTESSORI SCHOOL, IN vs JAZZMEN MORGAN | |||||||||
21CVI03743 | KATIE MCCORMICK | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
ALEXANDRIA MONTESSORI SCHOOL, IN vs KATIE MCCORMICK | |||||||||
22CVG02108 | MAKALIA GRANGER | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT LTD vs MAKALIA GRANGER | |||||||||
21CVF03229 | AMATULLAH GREENLEE | 2/21/2022 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs AMATULLAH GREENLEE | |||||||||
21CVF03234 | AMANDA CHAMBERS AND ANDRE BROWN | 2/21/2022 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs AMANDA CHAMBERS and ANDRE BROWN | |||||||||
21CVF02525 | AMY FITE | 2/21/2022 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs AMY FITE | |||||||||
21CVF02309 | ELIZABETH MCCARTER | 2/18/2022 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ELIZABETH MCCARTER | |||||||||
21CVF02828 | PAUL WISE | 2/18/2022 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs PAUL WISE | |||||||||
21CVF03398 | LAURA DUNKIN | 2/18/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs LAURA DUNKIN | |||||||||
21CVI03827 | ETIENNE G MANDELA | 2/17/2022 | |||||||
STEVE HARROP vs ETIENNE G MANDELA | |||||||||
21CVF03638 | DEANNA M PEAVY | 2/17/2022 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs DEANNA M PEAVY | |||||||||
21CVF03477 | MARCI A JOHANNES | 2/16/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs MARCI A JOHANNES | |||||||||
21CVF03301 | MISTER T HARVEY | 2/16/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs MISTER T HARVEY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 275, 276, 277 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |