Daily Law Journal
5510 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVG02520 EMILY NYE AND 7/22/2014
LSRK MANAGEMENT vs EMILY NYE and
14CVI02386 RACHEL TUSSEY 7/22/2014
K&KM ENTERPRISES INC DRYER VENT WIZARD OF DAYTON vs RACHEL TUSSEY
14CVI02524 STEPHEN ROUDEBUSH AND NATURES GRANITE 7/22/2014
SHELLIE WILDER and DONALD HALL vs STEPHEN ROUDEBUSH and NATURES GRANITE
14CVI02523 XS ELECTRICAL AND WILLIAM SNODDY 7/22/2014
VINCENT L GEBHARDT vs XS ELECTRICAL and WILLIAM SNODDY
14CVF02357 OLIVIA POE 7/21/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs OLIVIA POE
14CVI02263 JOSH COLE 7/17/2014
JENNIFER M WILSON vs JOSH COLE
14CVI02280 LARRY ANDERSON 7/16/2014
KAREN VAN NESS vs LARRY ANDERSON
14CVV00142 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 7/15/2014
JONATHAN C MILLER vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
13CVV00153 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV 7/15/2014
KENDRA WRIGHT vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV
14CVI02356 CENTERVILLE STONE & BRICK AND MR. VAN DAM 7/15/2014
PATIO SUPPLY vs CENTERVILLE STONE & BRICK and MR. VAN DAM
14CVI02513 MILCA NOTON 7/15/2014
MARIA ROSE and NOHEMI AGUILAR vs MILCA NOTON
14CVI02497 AUTOZONE 7/15/2014
HEATHER JORDAN and AUSTIN JORDAN vs AUTOZONE
12CVF03433 CONNIE D JONES 7/15/2014
MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP vs CONNIE D JONES
13CVI00479 MARY FRANCO AND CHRISTOPHER WAAG 7/15/2014
CHRISTOPHER D COLLINS vs MARY FRANCO and CHRISTOPHER WAAG
14CVG02162 MATT YOUNGERMAN AND JULIA YOUNGERMAN 7/15/2014
JASON WYSONG vs MATT YOUNGERMAN and JULIA YOUNGERMAN
11CVF03200 CAROLYN A SCALETTA 7/15/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs CAROLYN A SCALETTA
14CVG02512 JENNIFER STATEN 7/15/2014
JANET L WOOD vs JENNIFER STATEN
14CVG02505 GUY A VINCE 7/15/2014
GUY A VINCE Jr. vs GUY A VINCE
09CVF02944 BENJAMIN SPIRES 7/15/2014
DARRALL HUGHES vs BENJAMIN SPIRES

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... , 274, 275, 276  Next