15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVF02185 | SHONNELLE A FOSTER | 2/28/2022 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE, INC vs SHONNELLE A FOSTER | |||||||||
21CVF03590 | PAUL D ACKERMAN | 2/28/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs PAUL D ACKERMAN | |||||||||
22CVF02184 | ELSIE GRAHAM | 2/28/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs ELSIE GRAHAM | |||||||||
21CVF03482 | PAMELA D HEIKES | 2/25/2022 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs PAMELA D HEIKES | |||||||||
21CVF03158 | CODY SALYERS | 2/25/2022 | |||||||
DENT - A - MED INC. vs CODY SALYERS | |||||||||
21CVF02283 | KATHLEEN J COONEY | 2/25/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs KATHLEEN J COONEY | |||||||||
21CVF02538 | MELISSA HANKS | 2/25/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs MELISSA HANKS | |||||||||
21CVF02646 | VICTORIA WHITE | 2/25/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs VICTORIA WHITE | |||||||||
21CVI03339 | ORY'S GRANITE TOPS, LLC | 2/24/2022 | |||||||
MARK EWART and TRIPLE C INV., LLC vs ORY'S GRANITE TOPS, LLC | |||||||||
21CVI03338 | MIKE COMBS AND MY GRANITE DESIGNS | 2/24/2022 | |||||||
MARK EWART and TRIPLE C INV., INC vs MIKE COMBS and MY GRANITE DESIGNS | |||||||||
22CVF02165 | JACOB SECREST | 2/23/2022 | |||||||
SCIL, INC., SPEEDY CASH vs JACOB SECREST | |||||||||
21CVF03569 | ALICE M STARRETT | 2/23/2022 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs ALICE M STARRETT | |||||||||
21CVF02868 | TONIA Y COMBS | 2/23/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs TONIA Y COMBS | |||||||||
21CVF03809 | CHEYANNE GIBSON | 2/23/2022 | |||||||
RELIABLE AUTO FINANCE, INC vs CHEYANNE GIBSON | |||||||||
21CVF03438 | KIARA THOMPSON | 2/23/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs KIARA THOMPSON | |||||||||
22CVF02169 | MARJORY THORNTON | 2/23/2022 | |||||||
CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC vs MARJORY THORNTON | |||||||||
21CVF03714 | PHILLIP EBRIGHT | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs PHILLIP EBRIGHT | |||||||||
15CVF02814 | CHERYL L HARTKORN | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs CHERYL L HARTKORN | |||||||||
21CVG03353 | KEISHA BIRDSONG | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
LINING QI vs KEISHA BIRDSONG | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 273, 274, 275 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |