Daily Law Journal
5379 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVI02280 LARRY ANDERSON 5/13/2014
KAREN VAN NESS vs LARRY ANDERSON
14CVI02246 BRIAN WEYRICH 5/13/2014
MARTIN H NIZNY vs BRIAN WEYRICH
14CVI02240 JAMES CLAXON 5/13/2014
MICHAEL N MOORHEAD vs JAMES CLAXON
14CVI02311 DARLA KIBLER 5/13/2014
BENJAMIN POWELL and NICOLE POWELL vs DARLA KIBLER
14CVI02263 JOSH COLE 5/13/2014
JENNIFER M WILSON vs JOSH COLE
14CVN00001 CRAIG KELLOGG 5/8/2014
WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP vs CRAIG KELLOGG
14CVF02210 ACCOUNT RECOVERY CONSULTANTS INC AND ROBERT L LAKE... 5/6/2014
ENDODONTICS SOUTH INC vs ACCOUNT RECOVERY CONSULTANTS INC and ROBERT L LAKE...
14CVV00075 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 5/6/2014
JAMES L MACK vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
13CVF00898 WENDCENTRAL CORP 5/6/2014
WASTE MANAGEMENT OF OHIO, INC AN OHIO CORPORATION vs WENDCENTRAL CORP
13CVF00108 DENISE ANN THOMPSON 5/6/2014
GEORGE STEBERL III vs DENISE ANN THOMPSON
13CVF00183 THE CONNOR GROUP DBA STEEPLECHASE APARTMENTS 5/2/2014
DAVID MCGUIRE vs THE CONNOR GROUP dba STEEPLECHASE APARTMENTS
14CVF02018 SHAWN KRAMER 5/2/2014
OKINUS INC vs SHAWN KRAMER
11CVF03241 CHRISTOPHER K COKER 4/29/2014
FIFTH THIRD BANK AN OHIO BANKING CORPORATION vs CHRISTOPHER K COKER
14CVG02258 GINGER STROOP 4/29/2014
DOUGLAS H ENGBERSON and LINDA R ENGERBERSON vs GINGER STROOP
14CVG02256 GEORGIANNA SIMPSON 4/29/2014
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs GEORGIANNA SIMPSON
14CVG02254 ROBERT CARPENTER AND CHELSEA JEFFRIES 4/29/2014
THIRTY 43 BY THE GREENE vs ROBERT CARPENTER and CHELSEA JEFFRIES
13CVV00207 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 4/29/2014
JAMES S GARDNER vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
13CVF00858 ANGELA C COREY 4/29/2014
CREDIT INVESTMENTS, INC vs ANGELA C COREY

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... , 267, 268, 269  Next