Daily Law Journal
6584 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
16CVI02353 JESSICA EDITH RIGGINS AND BLUEGREEN HOME HEALTH CA... 11/1/2016
DAVID JONES and PENELOPE JONES vs JESSICA EDITH RIGGINS and BLUEGREEN HOME HEALTH CA....
16CVI02737 CYNTHIA TANG AND KATELYN R VANBIBBER 11/1/2016
DOUGLAS JAMES GWIN vs CYNTHIA TANG and KATELYN R VANBIBBER
16CVI02858 JAMES MIRACLE 11/1/2016
STEPHEN A WEEBER vs JAMES MIRACLE
16CVI02857 MARY TOWNSEND 11/1/2016
STEPHEN A WEBER vs MARY TOWNSEND
16CVI02856 JENNIFER M KIRKPATRICK 11/1/2016
STEPHEN -DPM WEEBER vs JENNIFER M KIRKPATRICK
16CVI02810 MARISSA K WHITENER 11/1/2016
MARGARET LOZANO vs MARISSA K WHITENER
16CVI02838 CHRISTOPHER WAMSLEY 11/1/2016
THOMAS R SCHIFF vs CHRISTOPHER WAMSLEY
16CVI02834 CAPITAL ONE BANK 11/1/2016
MARK THOMPSON vs CAPITAL ONE BANK
16CVF02833 CHEEK LAW OFFICES 471 E BROAD STREET 11/1/2016
MARK THOMPSON vs CHEEK LAW OFFICES 471 E BROAD STREET
16CVF02644 RANDEN ESTEP AND SARAH ESTEP 11/1/2016
AUSTIN CASTRO vs RANDEN ESTEP and SARAH ESTEP
16CVG02747 MARSHIE CRAWFORD 11/1/2016
KETTERING SQUARE APARTMENT, LP vs MARSHIE CRAWFORD
16CVG02913 ADIA LANE 11/1/2016
MILLER FARM APTS LLC RESERVE @ MILLER FARM vs ADIA LANE
15CVF03022 SOUTH METRO ICE, INC 11/1/2016
APPLIED MECHANICAL SYSTEMS INC vs SOUTH METRO ICE, INC
16CVV00112 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR 10/31/2016
DEBORA A GINNEVER vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR
16CVF02569 SOUTH DAYTON AUTO & TRUCK SERVIC 10/28/2016
THE PAPERS INC vs SOUTH DAYTON AUTO & TRUCK SERVIC
16CVV00143 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES 10/27/2016
KAILA L MCCLELLAN vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES
16CVV00148 DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES 10/27/2016
ASHLEY (SASS) WALTON vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
16CVV00122 DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES 10/27/2016
AARON ELTER vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
16CVF02320 KELLY JO MULLINS 10/26/2016
BCC WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP LLC vs KELLY JO MULLINS

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 266, 267, 268 ... 328, 329, 330  Next