15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVF02105 | MEGAN HUMPHRYS | 4/19/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs MEGAN HUMPHRYS | |||||||||
20CVF03078 | DAWN SALYERS | 4/19/2022 | |||||||
KELLY VANGORDER vs DAWN SALYERS | |||||||||
16CVF02815 | JOSEPH E YOUNG | 4/19/2022 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs JOSEPH E YOUNG | |||||||||
21CVI03843 | DAVID COX AND HEIDI COX | 4/19/2022 | |||||||
JAMES THOMPSON and MEGAN THOMPSON vs DAVID COX and HEIDI COX | |||||||||
22CVI02284 | AAMCO | 4/19/2022 | |||||||
HOWELL NEWMAN vs AAMCO | |||||||||
22CVI02314 | ALLSTAR FENCE COMPANY | 4/19/2022 | |||||||
DANIEL NEVLING and SAMANTHA NEVLING vs ALLSTAR FENCE COMPANY | |||||||||
22CVI02139 | TIRES UNLIMITED | 4/19/2022 | |||||||
SAYLOR WHITE vs TIRES UNLIMITED | |||||||||
22CVG02479 | JAMES DOUGLASS | 4/19/2022 | |||||||
JOSEPH BERNARDIN vs JAMES DOUGLASS | |||||||||
22CVF02077 | LASHONDA TYLER | 4/18/2022 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs LASHONDA TYLER | |||||||||
21CVF03647 | CLAVELITA PEKARSKI | 4/18/2022 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs CLAVELITA PEKARSKI | |||||||||
22CVH02506 | WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP | 4/15/2022 | |||||||
ELLEN LAUBIE vs WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP | |||||||||
21CVE03513 | ALEXANDER COREY WISECUP | 4/15/2022 | |||||||
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO vs ALEXANDER COREY WISECUP | |||||||||
21CVF03035 | KANUNGNIT LAWTON | 4/13/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs KANUNGNIT LAWTON | |||||||||
22CVF02079 | JAMES EASTER | 4/13/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs JAMES EASTER | |||||||||
22CVF02082 | DAVID KOVACS | 4/12/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs DAVID KOVACS | |||||||||
21CVF03840 | MANDI R DILLION | 4/12/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs MANDI R DILLION | |||||||||
21CVF03554 | NICHOLE R HATTON | 4/12/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs NICHOLE R HATTON | |||||||||
22CVF02102 | WILLIAM M JOHNSON | 4/12/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs WILLIAM M JOHNSON | |||||||||
22CVF02381 | DAVID HEDGER | 4/12/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs DAVID HEDGER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 254, 255, 256 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |