15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVI02549 | ALEX MESSER | 5/31/2022 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE REALTOR vs ALEX MESSER | |||||||||
22CVI02519 | PINNACLE ROAD AUTOMOTIVE | 5/31/2022 | |||||||
MALAIKA IVY vs PINNACLE ROAD AUTOMOTIVE | |||||||||
22CVI02547 | COURTNEY DIETERIE | 5/31/2022 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE REALTOR vs COURTNEY DIETERIE | |||||||||
22CVI02468 | SCHULTZ'S HOBBIES | 5/31/2022 | |||||||
ROBERT MERKLE vs SCHULTZ'S HOBBIES | |||||||||
22CVG02748 | SHAWNAE GLENN | 5/31/2022 | |||||||
INDEPENDENCE PROPERTY MGMT, LLC FOR JOSE MANUAL AYALA vs SHAWNAE GLENN | |||||||||
22CVG02518 | SHERRY CHAPMAN | 5/27/2022 | |||||||
WILLIAM WEBB vs SHERRY CHAPMAN | |||||||||
22CVF02056 | GUY WYSONG | 5/27/2022 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs GUY WYSONG | |||||||||
21CVF03873 | MICHAEL LEAR | 5/27/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHAEL LEAR | |||||||||
22CVI02419 | STEFAN YODER | 5/26/2022 | |||||||
EDWARD (NED) FORD and ISABEL FORD vs STEFAN YODER | |||||||||
22CVF02372 | NICHOLAS ANGLE AND MADISON BROWN-BOLES | 5/26/2022 | |||||||
CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK APARTMENTS vs NICHOLAS ANGLE and MADISON BROWN-BOLES | |||||||||
22CVI02006 | ESHIKA THORNTON | 5/26/2022 | |||||||
NATASHA COX vs ESHIKA THORNTON | |||||||||
22CVF02460 | BRANDON BARNETT | 5/25/2022 | |||||||
JILL MOHNEY vs BRANDON BARNETT | |||||||||
22CVF02407 | DENNIS M MCNEALY | 5/25/2022 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs DENNIS M MCNEALY | |||||||||
21CVF03849 | MARY GEORGE | 5/25/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MARY GEORGE | |||||||||
21CVF03095 | LISA M DUVALL | 5/25/2022 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs LISA M DUVALL | |||||||||
21CVF03876 | MANISHA PATEL | 5/25/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MANISHA PATEL | |||||||||
21CVF03862 | KRISTY MATTIS | 5/25/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KRISTY MATTIS | |||||||||
22CVF02433 | NATALIE R HALL | 5/25/2022 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs NATALIE R HALL | |||||||||
21CVF03511 | CHRISTYL L JANOW | 5/24/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs CHRISTYL L JANOW | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 241, 242, 243 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |