Daily Law Journal
5379 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVI02583 JASON T JONES 10/21/2014
MARIBETH GREENBERG vs JASON T JONES
14CVI02755 DESTYNI ROSEBERRY 10/21/2014
RENNY R CLARK vs DESTYNI ROSEBERRY
14CVI02746 TARGET TOOL RENTAL INC 10/21/2014
OSARENKHOE INNEH and OMOREGIE INNEH vs TARGET TOOL RENTAL INC
14CVI02742 COLLIN M HUSTON AND MICHELE L FRITZ 10/21/2014
DON WRIGHT REALTY LLC vs COLLIN M HUSTON and MICHELE L FRITZ
14CVI02740 JARED MIZRAHI AND PCI AUCTIONS 10/21/2014
A MARK EWART vs JARED MIZRAHI and PCI AUCTIONS
08CVF02459 DARLENE S HOUSTON 10/21/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (MFL) vs DARLENE S HOUSTON
14CVG02729 GARY L. GEPFREY 10/21/2014
KIN ON CHAN vs GARY L. GEPFREY
14CVG02750 SAMANTHA RAE HUTCHESON 10/21/2014
THIRTY 43 BY THE GREENE vs SAMANTHA RAE HUTCHESON
14CVG02749 EMILIO HUIZAR 10/21/2014
THIRTY 43 BY THE GREENE vs EMILIO HUIZAR
14CVG02735 JOHNATHON KENDRICK 10/21/2014
THOMAS L REAGAN vs JOHNATHON KENDRICK
14CVF02408 TIMOTHY N FRALEY 10/20/2014
CAVALRY SPV I LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES vs TIMOTHY N FRALEY
14CVF02336 LAVADA DONAPHIN 10/17/2014
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING vs LAVADA DONAPHIN
14CVF02624 FOX HUNT OWNER, LLC PRINCETON MANAGEMENT 10/17/2014
JONATHAN ABRAMSON and KATIE ABRAMSON and KATIE ABRAMSON and KATIE ABRAMSON vs FOX HUN...
13CVF00835 MARY M CLARK 10/17/2014
FIA CARD SERVICES vs MARY M CLARK
14CVF02617 DOUG PUND 10/16/2014
JAFFE JEWELRY vs DOUG PUND
14CVF02521 ROBBY FARRAJ AND AMANI DARI 10/15/2014
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES LTD vs ROBBY FARRAJ and AMANI DARI
08CVF03937 JEWELL DAVIES 10/15/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JEWELL DAVIES
14CVG02714 AMANDA WIESEMANN 10/14/2014
STAN DISHON vs AMANDA WIESEMANN
14CVH02758 CITY OF CENTERVILLE 10/14/2014
LOGAN BURNS vs CITY OF CENTERVILLE

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 240, 241, 242 ... 267, 268, 269  Next