15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVF02737 | APRIL JENNINGS | 8/8/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs APRIL JENNINGS | |||||||||
21CVF03181 | STACEY J LUBBERS | 8/8/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs STACEY J LUBBERS | |||||||||
22CVF02855 | LIA BRAGG | 8/8/2022 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC vs LIA BRAGG | |||||||||
22CVF02823 | BRENTON Z WOODDELL | 8/8/2022 | |||||||
CREDITMAX INC vs BRENTON Z WOODDELL | |||||||||
21CVF03214 | PAULINE FISHER | 8/5/2022 | |||||||
JHPDE FINANCE I, LLC. vs PAULINE FISHER | |||||||||
21CVF03192 | RUBY DAVIS | 8/5/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs RUBY DAVIS | |||||||||
22CVI02696 | KIMBERLY T. LOUIS AND CHRISTINE BARSFORD | 8/4/2022 | |||||||
BOB MAYBERRY vs KIMBERLY T. LOUIS and CHRISTINE BARSFORD | |||||||||
22CVF02813 | KRISTIN BRANDENBURG | 8/4/2022 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs KRISTIN BRANDENBURG | |||||||||
22CVF02275 | SASHA THREATTS | 8/3/2022 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC vs SASHA THREATTS | |||||||||
22CVF02677 | SHARON KAY LUBBERS | 8/3/2022 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs SHARON KAY LUBBERS | |||||||||
22CVI02695 | JEFFERY G RICHMOND | 8/3/2022 | |||||||
TRACI MOORE vs JEFFERY G RICHMOND | |||||||||
22CVF02307 | KRISTOFFER L COOK | 8/2/2022 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs KRISTOFFER L COOK | |||||||||
22CVF02491 | ANDREW GEESAMAN | 8/2/2022 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO LPA vs ANDREW GEESAMAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 216, 217, 218 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |