15518 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVI03134 | AMANDA GRAY | 9/27/2022 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE vs AMANDA GRAY | |||||||||
22CVI03132 | AIMEE TIBBS | 9/27/2022 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE vs AIMEE TIBBS | |||||||||
22CVF02344 | GRISMER TIRE COMPANY | 9/26/2022 | |||||||
ANN MCWILLIAMS vs GRISMER TIRE COMPANY | |||||||||
22CVF03035 | FLOYD POOLE | 9/23/2022 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs FLOYD POOLE | |||||||||
22CVV00031 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 9/23/2022 | |||||||
KELSEY PRUITT vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
22CVF02621 | ANDRES PEREZ | 9/22/2022 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs ANDRES PEREZ | |||||||||
22CVF02858 | JEFF J WILLIAMS | 9/22/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA vs JEFF J WILLIAMS | |||||||||
22CVF02878 | WILLIAM FULLER | 9/22/2022 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs WILLIAM FULLER | |||||||||
22CVF02508 | APRIL W RAMEY | 9/22/2022 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO WRIGHT STATE UNIVERSITY vs APRIL W RAMEY | |||||||||
22CVF02084 | BRYAN S PATERCHAK | 9/22/2022 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA vs BRYAN S PATERCHAK | |||||||||
22CVF02606 | BRIAN A LAMBERT | 9/22/2022 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs BRIAN A LAMBERT | |||||||||
22CVF02640 | KYREN WILLIAMS | 9/22/2022 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE, INC vs KYREN WILLIAMS | |||||||||
22CVF02681 | AARON HAMBLIN | 9/22/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs AARON HAMBLIN | |||||||||
22CVI03182 | HANK A BROCK | 9/22/2022 | |||||||
LAWRENCE IMUNDO vs HANK A BROCK | |||||||||
22CVI02731 | JOSE CRUZ | 9/22/2022 | |||||||
JOY BARNHILL vs JOSE CRUZ | |||||||||
22CVG02684 | KIEL GREENLEE AND ANGELA GREENLEE | 9/21/2022 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP FOR DOVETREE TIC 1 LLC et al 6 vs KIEL GREENLEE and ANGELA GREENLEE | |||||||||
21CVF03391 | DOVETREE APARTMENTS | 9/21/2022 | |||||||
KIEL GREENLEE vs DOVETREE APARTMENTS | |||||||||
22CVF02434 | JASMINE M BOLDEN | 9/21/2022 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs JASMINE M BOLDEN | |||||||||
22CVF02740 | ERIK MASTERSON AND BOBBI MOUNTJOY AND MIKAYLA MAST... | 9/20/2022 | |||||||
FOX HUNT OWNER LLC vs ERIK MASTERSON and BOBBI MOUNTJOY and MIKAYLA MAST... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 187, 188, 189 ... 774, 775, 776 Next |