15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVF02434 | JASMINE M BOLDEN | 10/31/2022 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs JASMINE M BOLDEN | |||||||||
22CVI03365 | JIM DEAL | 10/28/2022 | |||||||
RONALD L WEIR vs JIM DEAL | |||||||||
22CVH03223 | CITY OF CENTERVILLE | 10/28/2022 | |||||||
AMANDA WADE vs CITY OF CENTERVILLE | |||||||||
22CVF02344 | GRISMER TIRE COMPANY | 10/28/2022 | |||||||
ANN MCWILLIAMS vs GRISMER TIRE COMPANY | |||||||||
22CVF03207 | DAVID SCHMERBER | 10/27/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DAVID SCHMERBER | |||||||||
22CVF03322 | JACK S WOODMAN | 10/27/2022 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JACK S WOODMAN | |||||||||
21CVG03468 | LAQUISHA ANDERSON | 10/26/2022 | |||||||
DELIA MCKENZIE vs LAQUISHA ANDERSON | |||||||||
22CVG03631 | JOSEPH MARTIN | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
NEW HUNTLEY RIDGE LLC SUCCESSER IN INTEREST TO: CINCIN vs JOSEPH MARTIN | |||||||||
22CVG03630 | JOHNATHAN KENDRICK | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
NEW HUNTLEY RIDGE LLC SUCCESSER IN INTEREST TO: CINCIN vs JOHNATHAN KENDRICK | |||||||||
22CVG03629 | JASMINE LAWSON | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
NEW HUNTLEY RIDGE LLC SUCCESSER IN INTEREST TO: CINCIN vs JASMINE LAWSON | |||||||||
22CVG03626 | KASEY A TIMERDING AND MICHAEL T HATHAWAY | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LL vs KASEY A TIMERDING and MICHAEL T HATHAWAY | |||||||||
22CVG03625 | CRYSTALL TUCKER | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
ROBERT C SHANNON vs CRYSTALL TUCKER | |||||||||
22CVG03622 | DWAYNE COUCH AND TINA COUCH | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
NICHOLAS R BAYMAN vs DWAYNE COUCH and TINA COUCH | |||||||||
22CVI02461 | ARDEN M LEHMAN | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
SIEARRA R SMITH vs ARDEN M LEHMAN | |||||||||
22CVF03389 | JACOB R GLENN | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs JACOB R GLENN | |||||||||
22CVE03196 | DAI'SEAN L CONLEY AND CHARLOTTE A CONLEY AND PROGR... | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
JEFFREY W HUNTER vs DAI'SEAN L CONLEY and CHARLOTTE A CONLEY and PROGR... | |||||||||
22CVF02772 | SALLY ANSPACH | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs SALLY ANSPACH | |||||||||
22CVF02224 | GLENNA REESE | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO LPA vs GLENNA REESE | |||||||||
22CVF03323 | STEPHEN J COLE | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs STEPHEN J COLE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 183, 184, 185 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |