15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVG03681 | MEGAN FITZWATER | 11/1/2022 | |||||||
MANCO PROPERTY SERVICES vs MEGAN FITZWATER | |||||||||
22CVG03682 | CODY BARRETT | 11/1/2022 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs CODY BARRETT | |||||||||
22CVG03683 | WYNTER JAMES | 11/1/2022 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs WYNTER JAMES | |||||||||
22CVG03684 | MARK COWARD | 11/1/2022 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs MARK COWARD | |||||||||
22CVI03021 | JO ANN BRUENING | 11/1/2022 | |||||||
TIMOTHY ALLAN BRUENING vs JO ANN BRUENING | |||||||||
22CVI03562 | TAYLER J STEELE | 11/1/2022 | |||||||
TANVIR KALER vs TAYLER J STEELE | |||||||||
22CVI03501 | TBC CORPORATION CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY | 11/1/2022 | |||||||
DONALD HILL Jr. vs TBC CORPORATION CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY | |||||||||
22CVI03315 | JEREMY S JOHNSON | 11/1/2022 | |||||||
RONY COREA vs JEREMY S JOHNSON | |||||||||
22CVI03387 | TOM WENDLING | 11/1/2022 | |||||||
FLOYD NEWMAN and PAULINE NEWMAN vs TOM WENDLING | |||||||||
22CVG03680 | TAYLOR LUECK AND BRITTANY LUECK | 11/1/2022 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs TAYLOR LUECK and BRITTANY LUECK | |||||||||
22CVF02434 | JASMINE M BOLDEN | 10/31/2022 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs JASMINE M BOLDEN | |||||||||
22CVI03365 | JIM DEAL | 10/28/2022 | |||||||
RONALD L WEIR vs JIM DEAL | |||||||||
22CVH03223 | CITY OF CENTERVILLE | 10/28/2022 | |||||||
AMANDA WADE vs CITY OF CENTERVILLE | |||||||||
22CVF02344 | GRISMER TIRE COMPANY | 10/28/2022 | |||||||
ANN MCWILLIAMS vs GRISMER TIRE COMPANY | |||||||||
22CVF03207 | DAVID SCHMERBER | 10/27/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DAVID SCHMERBER | |||||||||
22CVF03322 | JACK S WOODMAN | 10/27/2022 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JACK S WOODMAN | |||||||||
21CVG03468 | LAQUISHA ANDERSON | 10/26/2022 | |||||||
DELIA MCKENZIE vs LAQUISHA ANDERSON | |||||||||
22CVF02654 | GINA MADZIA | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs GINA MADZIA | |||||||||
22CVF03323 | STEPHEN J COLE | 10/25/2022 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs STEPHEN J COLE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 180, 181, 182 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |