15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVI03810 | TRUE CARE AUTO REPAIR LLC | 1/17/2023 | |||||||
ROBERT CASTILLO vs TRUE CARE AUTO REPAIR LLC | |||||||||
22CVI03884 | RANON KISCH | 1/17/2023 | |||||||
KELLY BLUNDELL vs RANON KISCH | |||||||||
22CVF04052 | JOHN ALLNUTT | 1/17/2023 | |||||||
ADLP INVESTMENTS LLC, SERIES 1 vs JOHN ALLNUTT | |||||||||
22CVI03936 | GRIND TIME MASONRY AND MIKE COLLINS | 1/17/2023 | |||||||
BETSY PALMER vs GRIND TIME MASONRY and MIKE COLLINS | |||||||||
22CVF02394 | BRIAN LAMBERT | 1/13/2023 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs BRIAN LAMBERT | |||||||||
22CVG03998 | MIKE POWERS | 1/13/2023 | |||||||
GEM CITY MHP LLC vs MIKE POWERS | |||||||||
22CVG03995 | AMY PATEL | 1/13/2023 | |||||||
HMA ALLURE LLC vs AMY PATEL | |||||||||
22CVG03997 | SHAWNETTA LYNN WHITE AND EMMANUEL WHITE AND KAMERO... | 1/13/2023 | |||||||
MILLER FARM APARTMENTS LLC vs SHAWNETTA LYNN WHITE and EMMANUEL WHITE and KAMERO... | |||||||||
22CVF03572 | EVANS EXPEDITE LLC | 1/12/2023 | |||||||
PELLA SALES INC vs EVANS EXPEDITE LLC | |||||||||
21CVF03766 | DARRIN SCHLUTER | 1/12/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DARRIN SCHLUTER | |||||||||
22CVF03712 | BRYAN A PENNINGTON AND CASSANDRA H PENNINGTON | 1/4/2023 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs BRYAN A PENNINGTON AND CASSANDRA H PENNINGTON | |||||||||
22CVI03778 | ANGEL INFANTE FERNANDEZ | 1/4/2023 | |||||||
MARCUS HENDERSON vs ANGEL INFANTE FERNANDEZ | |||||||||
22CVF02853 | KRYSTAL RUPERT | 1/4/2023 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs KRYSTAL RUPERT | |||||||||
22CVF03518 | FAITH R GILLETT | 1/4/2023 | |||||||
U.S.BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs FAITH R GILLETT | |||||||||
22CVF03725 | THOMAS TEAGUE | 1/4/2023 | |||||||
FIFTH THIRD BANK, N.A. C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs THOMAS TEAGUE | |||||||||
22CVF03711 | STACIE O HANKS AND ROBERT L HANKS | 1/4/2023 | |||||||
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC vs STACIE O HANKS AND ROBERT L HANKS | |||||||||
22CVE03294 | RANDY A DUVALLAND ROBERT RICE | 1/3/2023 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs RANDY A DUVALLAND ROBERT RICE | |||||||||
22CVF03416 | RACHEL WILLIAMS | 1/3/2023 | |||||||
Q&S PROPERTIES LLC vs RACHEL WILLIAMS | |||||||||
22CVF03202 | MELISSA LOVE | 1/3/2023 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs MELISSA LOVE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 157, 158, 159 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |