15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVG02278 | 3/7/2023 | ||||||||
OHIO COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE & PR FOR MISSOULA VALLEY PROP. IINVES vs | |||||||||
23CVG02279 | 3/7/2023 | ||||||||
VAUGHAN GROUP, LTD FOR CHATHAM VILLAGE, LTD vs | |||||||||
23CVG02280 | 3/7/2023 | ||||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES, LLC for VB ONE LLC vs | |||||||||
23CVG02291 | 3/7/2023 | ||||||||
TDI PROPERTIES LLC vs | |||||||||
23CVG02292 | 3/7/2023 | ||||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT GROUP AGENT FOR MIMG XXVIII HERITAGE S vs | |||||||||
23CVI02174 | 3/7/2023 | ||||||||
MARSHA GROSMANN vs | |||||||||
23CVG02277 | 3/7/2023 | ||||||||
GEM CITY MHP, LLC vs | |||||||||
22CVF03437 | 3/6/2023 | ||||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs | |||||||||
22CVF03719 | 3/6/2023 | ||||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs | |||||||||
22CVF03338 | 3/6/2023 | ||||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs | |||||||||
22CVG04071 | 3/3/2023 | ||||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FOR GOVERNOURS SQUARE , LLC vs | |||||||||
22CVI03778 | 3/3/2023 | ||||||||
MARCUS HENDERSON vs | |||||||||
22CVI03367 | 3/3/2023 | ||||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE vs | |||||||||
22CVF04049 | 3/3/2023 | ||||||||
LANDMARK ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION (HERITAGE ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs | |||||||||
22CVF03773 | 3/2/2023 | ||||||||
WILSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL vs | |||||||||
22CVF03879 | 3/2/2023 | ||||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs | |||||||||
22CVE03196 | DAI'SEAN L CONLEY AND CHARLOTTE A CONLEY AND PROGR... | 3/1/2023 | |||||||
JEFFREY W HUNTER vs DAI'SEAN L CONLEY and CHARLOTTE A CONLEY and PROGR... | |||||||||
22CVF03972 | TELITHA PATRICK | 3/1/2023 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs TELITHA PATRICK | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 141, 142, 143 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |