15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVF02489 | BRIAN S KINNISON | 4/18/2023 | |||||||
MYUSA CREDIT UNION INC vs BRIAN S KINNISON | |||||||||
23CVF02066 | KYLE LOONEY AND HEIDI M SANDERS | 4/17/2023 | |||||||
DOVETREE TIC 1. LLC vs KYLE LOONEY and HEIDI M SANDERS | |||||||||
22CVF04062 | GAYE ANDERSON | 4/17/2023 | |||||||
WELLS FARGO BANK NA vs GAYE ANDERSON | |||||||||
22CVF03913 | CRYSTAL BURNS | 4/17/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs CRYSTAL BURNS | |||||||||
23CVH02492 | PAYTON FRY | 4/14/2023 | |||||||
DAYTON HUMANE SOCIETY vs PAYTON FRY | |||||||||
22CVF02990 | DELOIS SWEENEY | 4/13/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DELOIS SWEENEY | |||||||||
22CVF02816 | ALEX ROHRBACK | 4/13/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ALEX ROHRBACK | |||||||||
22CVF04029 | GINA MADZIA | 4/12/2023 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs GINA MADZIA | |||||||||
23CVF02019 | TEASHA BELL | 4/12/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TEASHA BELL | |||||||||
23CVF02153 | JESSICA OWENS | 4/12/2023 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES vs JESSICA OWENS | |||||||||
22CVF02853 | KRYSTAL RUPERT | 4/12/2023 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs KRYSTAL RUPERT | |||||||||
22CVF02773 | JOSHUA MEYER | 4/12/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JOSHUA MEYER | |||||||||
22CVF03279 | DONALD PHILLIPS | 4/12/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DONALD PHILLIPS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 130, 131, 132 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |