15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVF02387 | ANTHONY BAILEY | 5/8/2023 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs ANTHONY BAILEY | |||||||||
22CVF02611 | ROBERT BLEVINS | 5/5/2023 | |||||||
RESURGENT RECEIVABLES LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs ROBERT BLEVINS | |||||||||
22CVF03772 | ELEVATE SPORTS TRAINING, LLC | 5/4/2023 | |||||||
ROSENTHAL & ROSENTHAL INC vs ELEVATE SPORTS TRAINING, LLC | |||||||||
22CVF03983 | KASHINA HURLEY | 5/3/2023 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs KASHINA HURLEY | |||||||||
22CVF02767 | JOSHUA MEYER | 5/3/2023 | |||||||
RESURGENT RECEIVABLES LLC vs JOSHUA MEYER | |||||||||
22CVF03887 | BENJAMIN OSTERFELD | 5/3/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs BENJAMIN OSTERFELD | |||||||||
22CVF03317 | ROOSEVELT ELLIS | 5/3/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs ROOSEVELT ELLIS | |||||||||
23CVF02084 | KASSIA N GILBERT | 5/3/2023 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs KASSIA N GILBERT | |||||||||
20CVF02564 | KATHY SEALS | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
CVI SGP-CO ACQUISITION TRUST vs KATHY SEALS | |||||||||
20CVF02063 | MARGARETTE HEARD | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MARGARETTE HEARD | |||||||||
21CVF03434 | JEFFERY POLEN | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs JEFFERY POLEN | |||||||||
12CVF03421 | RHONDA WEBB | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
AUTOMOTIVE CREDIT CORP vs RHONDA WEBB | |||||||||
22CVI02638 | TYLER BOWLING | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
RINALDO DISALVO vs TYLER BOWLING | |||||||||
22CVF03416 | RACHEL WILLIAMS | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
Q&S PROPERTIES LLC vs RACHEL WILLIAMS | |||||||||
23CVF02220 | KAREN SMITH | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE, INC vs KAREN SMITH | |||||||||
22CVF03540 | CHARLES SIMAN | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs CHARLES SIMAN | |||||||||
22CVF03985 | JAIZOHN PEAVY | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs JAIZOHN PEAVY | |||||||||
23CVF02056 | CATHY L CARPENTER | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs CATHY L CARPENTER | |||||||||
23CVF02057 | MALCOLM A REVERE JR. | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs MALCOLM A REVERE Jr. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 122, 123, 124 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |