15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVG02570 | CHAUNTEE DAVIS | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
HMA ALLURE LLC vs CHAUNTEE DAVIS | |||||||||
23CVG02571 | STEPHEN HENNINGER | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
COASTAL RIDGE REAL ESTATE vs STEPHEN HENNINGER | |||||||||
23CVG02579 | CHERYL LAMB | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP FOR DOVETREE TIC 1 LLC et al 6 vs CHERYL LAMB | |||||||||
23CVG02580 | SHAYNA KRAILLER | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
MOSS OAK ENTERPRISES LLC MOSS OAK INVESTMENTS LLC vs SHAYNA KRAILLER | |||||||||
23CVG02581 | CHASTITY RICHARDSON | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
HEARTLAND CENTERVILLE LLC vs CHASTITY RICHARDSON | |||||||||
23CVG02582 | JA'SHAUNNA WINSTON | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
HEARTLAND CENTERVILLE, LLC vs JA'SHAUNNA WINSTON | |||||||||
22CVI03936 | GRIND TIME MASONRY AND MIKE COLLINS | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
BETSY PALMER vs GRIND TIME MASONRY and MIKE COLLINS | |||||||||
23CVI02418 | FREDDY MVUKIRE | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
OLD LANE VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSO C/O KAMAN & CUSIMANO, LLC vs FREDDY MVUKIRE | |||||||||
23CVG02569 | JANISHA SMITH | 5/2/2023 | |||||||
KEO MANAGEMENT, LLC vs JANISHA SMITH | |||||||||
23CVF02116 | JEFF BARKER | 5/1/2023 | |||||||
HOCHWALT & SCHIFF, LLC vs JEFF BARKER | |||||||||
22CVE03029 | DEBRAY ENTERPRISES INC | 4/28/2023 | |||||||
BURNETTE CLINGMAN vs DEBRAY ENTERPRISES INC | |||||||||
23CVG02314 | LADACHIA WILLIAMS | 4/27/2023 | |||||||
HEARTLAND CENTERVILLE, LLC vs LADACHIA WILLIAMS | |||||||||
23CVI02174 | SHAN SMITH AND SOUTH DAYTON AUTO TRUCK SALES & SER... | 4/27/2023 | |||||||
MARSHA GROSMANN vs SHAN SMITH and SOUTH DAYTON AUTO TRUCK SALES & SER... | |||||||||
22CVF02995 | CHELSY TWAITS | 4/27/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CHELSY TWAITS | |||||||||
22CVF03276 | KENDRA NICKELL | 4/27/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KENDRA NICKELL | |||||||||
22CVF04030 | JASON ROCHA | 4/26/2023 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JASON ROCHA | |||||||||
22CVF03722 | DEANTE T HOLDEN | 4/26/2023 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC vs DEANTE T HOLDEN | |||||||||
23CVF02059 | ANNIE BARNETTE | 4/26/2023 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs ANNIE BARNETTE | |||||||||
23CVF02170 | PENNY MEYERS | 4/26/2023 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs PENNY MEYERS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 121, 122, 123 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |