15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVI02339 | DEPENDABLE AWNING (JIMMIE DEEL) | 5/16/2023 | |||||||
BARRY K GORMAN vs DEPENDABLE AWNING (JIMMIE DEEL) | |||||||||
22CVF03556 | LISA DUVALL | 5/15/2023 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs LISA DUVALL | |||||||||
22CVF02757 | DOUGLAS HASTINGS | 5/15/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DOUGLAS HASTINGS | |||||||||
22CVF03115 | BETHANN GASPARINI | 5/15/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BETHANN GASPARINI | |||||||||
22CVF03962 | QUIANNA LEONARD | 5/15/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs QUIANNA LEONARD | |||||||||
22CVF03496 | MARK JOHNSON | 5/12/2023 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs MARK JOHNSON | |||||||||
22CVF03529 | EMMANUEL OWOEYE | 5/11/2023 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs EMMANUEL OWOEYE | |||||||||
23CVF02328 | ROBERT M KEATON | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs ROBERT M KEATON | |||||||||
23CVF02151 | SHERIF A HEDAYAT | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS, LLC vs SHERIF A HEDAYAT | |||||||||
22CVF04016 | PATIENCE HARMON | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS vs PATIENCE HARMON | |||||||||
22CVF03717 | JOSHUA WOLF | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs JOSHUA WOLF | |||||||||
22CVF03897 | LINDA LLACERA | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs LINDA LLACERA | |||||||||
22CVF03965 | TYLER W CURLEY | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TYLER W CURLEY | |||||||||
22CVF03933 | LOREAN F LYONS | 5/9/2023 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs LOREAN F LYONS | |||||||||
22CVF03553 | SHARON METZLER | 5/9/2023 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs SHARON METZLER | |||||||||
22CVF03393 | TINA PARTENACH | 5/9/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs TINA PARTENACH | |||||||||
22CVF04073 | APRIL D KING | 5/9/2023 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs APRIL D KING | |||||||||
23CVH02516 | CITY OF CENTERVILLE OH | 5/9/2023 | |||||||
AMY KORENYI-BOTH vs CITY OF CENTERVILLE OH | |||||||||
23CVE02331 | LINCOLN N SCHREIBER, EMILY SCHREIBER N.S. (A MINOR... | 5/9/2023 | |||||||
JAMES P JENSEN vs LINCOLN N SCHREIBER, EMILY SCHREIBER N.S. (A MINOR... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 118, 119, 120 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |