15518 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVG02643 | JADA POINTER | 5/16/2023 | |||||||
BRG REALTY GROUP LLC AGENT FOR ROSELAWN CENTER LP vs JADA POINTER | |||||||||
23CVG02644 | EBONEE ZACHARY & BRENAY ZACHARY | 5/16/2023 | |||||||
HEARTLAND CENTERVILLE LLC vs EBONEE ZACHARY & BRENAY ZACHARY | |||||||||
23CVG02645 | BRADLEY DUNCAN & LAUREN DUNCAN | 5/16/2023 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT LLC FOR FOX HUNT OWNER LLC vs BRADLEY DUNCAN & LAUREN DUNCAN | |||||||||
23CVG02569 | JANISHA SMITH | 5/16/2023 | |||||||
KEO MANAGEMENT, LLC vs JANISHA SMITH | |||||||||
23CVI02442 | TANNENBERG KENNALS INC | 5/16/2023 | |||||||
STEPHEN HARNESS vs TANNENBERG KENNALS INC | |||||||||
23CVI02339 | DEPENDABLE AWNING (JIMMIE DEEL) | 5/16/2023 | |||||||
BARRY K GORMAN vs DEPENDABLE AWNING (JIMMIE DEEL) | |||||||||
23CVG02641 | JOHN BURDGE & MICHAEL COX | 5/16/2023 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs JOHN BURDGE & MICHAEL COX | |||||||||
22CVF03962 | QUIANNA LEONARD | 5/15/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs QUIANNA LEONARD | |||||||||
22CVF03115 | BETHANN GASPARINI | 5/15/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BETHANN GASPARINI | |||||||||
22CVF02757 | DOUGLAS HASTINGS | 5/15/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DOUGLAS HASTINGS | |||||||||
22CVF03556 | LISA DUVALL | 5/15/2023 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs LISA DUVALL | |||||||||
22CVF03496 | MARK JOHNSON | 5/12/2023 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs MARK JOHNSON | |||||||||
22CVF03529 | EMMANUEL OWOEYE | 5/11/2023 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs EMMANUEL OWOEYE | |||||||||
22CVF03965 | TYLER W CURLEY | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TYLER W CURLEY | |||||||||
22CVF03897 | LINDA LLACERA | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs LINDA LLACERA | |||||||||
22CVF03717 | JOSHUA WOLF | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs JOSHUA WOLF | |||||||||
23CVF02328 | ROBERT M KEATON | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs ROBERT M KEATON | |||||||||
22CVF04016 | PATIENCE HARMON | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS vs PATIENCE HARMON | |||||||||
23CVF02151 | SHERIF A HEDAYAT | 5/10/2023 | |||||||
CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS, LLC vs SHERIF A HEDAYAT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 111, 112, 113 ... 774, 775, 776 Next |