26956 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2014DM00555 | 11/4/2014 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2014DM00556 | 11/4/2014 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2014DM00557 | 11/4/2014 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2014DM00550 | 11/3/2014 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2014DM00551 | 11/3/2014 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2014DM00552 | 11/3/2014 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2014DM00553 | 11/3/2014 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2014DM00554 | 11/3/2014 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2014DR01051 | AMARKINE AMARTEY | 11/3/2014 | |||||||
Brenda Wilburn Amartey vs Amarkine Amartey | |||||||||
2014DR01052 | JAMES C BROOKS | 11/3/2014 | |||||||
Katherine L Brooks vs James C Brooks | |||||||||
2014DR01053 | ARANS BRIDGEMAN | 11/3/2014 | |||||||
Annquinniece Bridgeman vs Arans Bridgeman | |||||||||
2014DM00549 | 10/31/2014 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2014DR01048 | STACEY HUNT | 10/31/2014 | |||||||
Robert F Hunt Jr vs Stacey Hunt | |||||||||
2014DR01050 | ALEXANDER EDWARDS III | 10/31/2014 | |||||||
Tiffanie Edwards vs Alexander Edwards Iii | |||||||||
2014DM00548 | 10/30/2014 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2014DR01041 | VICTOR L ALLSTUN | 10/30/2014 | |||||||
Kelley M Allstun vs Victor L Allstun | |||||||||
2014DR01044 | ROBERT EDWARD UTTERMOHLEN | 10/30/2014 | |||||||
Angela Nicole Uttermohlen vs Robert Edward Uttermohlen | |||||||||
2014DR01045 | FRANCISCO CARDOSO FLORES | 10/30/2014 | |||||||
Teresa Dawn Cardoso vs Francisco Cardoso Flores | |||||||||
2014DR01039 | DARYL D WADE | 10/29/2014 | |||||||
Meagan Sherel Rodriguez vs Daryl D Wade | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1134, 1135, 1136 ... 1346, 1347, 1348 Next |