26985 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2015DM00012 | 1/12/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00008 | 1/9/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00009 | 1/9/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00010 | 1/9/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00011 | 1/9/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DR00014 | LORI D ANDERSON | 1/9/2015 | |||||||
Jeffery D Anderson vs Lori D Anderson | |||||||||
2015DR00015 | CARLYN JOY | 1/9/2015 | |||||||
Darren Joy vs Carlyn Joy | |||||||||
2015DR00016 | DANIEL C PERRY | 1/9/2015 | |||||||
Carrie S Perry vs Daniel C Perry | |||||||||
2015DR00010 | JEREMY L WITTMAN | 1/8/2015 | |||||||
Shauna D Wittman vs Jeremy L Wittman | |||||||||
2015DR00011 | ASHLEY S SELMON | 1/8/2015 | |||||||
Michael N Selmon vs Ashley S Selmon | |||||||||
2015DR00012 | MELISSA M COLLINSWORTH | 1/8/2015 | |||||||
David R Collinsworth vs Melissa M Collinsworth | |||||||||
2015DR00013 | KAREN A MCELROY | 1/8/2015 | |||||||
Kevin J McElroy vs Karen A McElroy | |||||||||
2015DM00005 | 1/7/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00006 | 1/7/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DR00007 | GURBINDER SINGH | 1/7/2015 | |||||||
Sukhjeet Takhar vs Gurbinder Singh | |||||||||
2015DR00008 | LISA M LOWERY | 1/7/2015 | |||||||
John L Lowery vs Lisa M Lowery | |||||||||
2015DR00009 | WADIH T DAGHER | 1/7/2015 | |||||||
Suha W Ayoub Dagher vs Wadih T Dagher | |||||||||
2015DR00004 | JAMIE D THOMAS | 1/6/2015 | |||||||
Jessica E Thomas vs Jamie D Thomas | |||||||||
2015DR00005 | KEVIN R HUTTEN | 1/6/2015 | |||||||
Kym P Hutten vs Kevin R Hutten | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1123, 1124, 1125 ... 1348, 1349, 1350 Next |