26963 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2015DM00315 | 7/10/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00313 | 7/9/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00314 | 7/9/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DR00674 | JAMES D WILLIFORD | 7/9/2015 | |||||||
Alexis Williford vs James D Williford | |||||||||
2015DM00311 | 7/8/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00312 | 7/8/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DR00668 | JEAN L WALKER | 7/8/2015 | |||||||
Michelle J Blair vs Jean L Walker | |||||||||
2015DR00669 | ABE J HENDERSON | 7/8/2015 | |||||||
Tracy L Henderson vs Abe J Henderson | |||||||||
2015DR00670 | JASON M HALL | 7/8/2015 | |||||||
Mika L Hall vs Jason M Hall | |||||||||
2015DR00671 | DUSTIN M SPARACO | 7/8/2015 | |||||||
Robin Lynn Sparaco vs Dustin M Sparaco | |||||||||
2015DR00672 | JOSHUA M STEWART | 7/8/2015 | |||||||
Hollie M Stewart vs Joshua M Stewart | |||||||||
2015DR00673 | RICKEY R DORSEY | 7/8/2015 | |||||||
Latoya E Dorsey vs Rickey R Dorsey | |||||||||
2015DM00307 | 7/7/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00308 | 7/7/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00309 | 7/7/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00310 | 7/7/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DR00666 | JUNELL L PURTEE GOODMAN | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
Timothy S Goodman vs Junell L Purtee Goodman | |||||||||
2015DR00667 | BOBBY KRUEGER | 7/7/2015 | |||||||
Samer A Elayyan vs Bobby Krueger | |||||||||
2015DR00664 | REGINA SUE KAURICH | 7/6/2015 | |||||||
Harry Russell Taylor vs Regina Sue Kaurich | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1071, 1072, 1073 ... 1347, 1348, 1349 Next |