26926 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2015DR01029 | DAVID W MCDANIEL | 10/29/2015 | |||||||
Jill C McDaniel vs David W McDaniel | |||||||||
2015DR01028 | JAMES GRASS | 10/29/2015 | |||||||
Jennifer Grass vs James Grass | |||||||||
2015DM00535 | 10/28/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DR01025 | CARIE L PHILLIPS | 10/28/2015 | |||||||
Robert D Phillips vs Carie L Phillips | |||||||||
2015DR01026 | JOSEPH MITCHELL | 10/28/2015 | |||||||
Khyanne Mitchell vs Joseph Mitchell | |||||||||
2015DR01027 | KIMBERLY S BAILEY | 10/28/2015 | |||||||
Timothy J Bailey vs Kimberly S Bailey | |||||||||
2015DM00533 | 10/27/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00534 | 10/27/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DR01024 | TIFFANY NICOLE HOMER | 10/27/2015 | |||||||
Christopher Lee Homer vs Tiffany Nicole Homer | |||||||||
2015DM00530 | 10/26/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00531 | 10/26/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DM00532 | 10/26/2015 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2015DR01021 | WARREN F SCHNEIDER | 10/23/2015 | |||||||
Kerrie L Schneider vs Warren F Schneider | |||||||||
2015DR01022 | THOMAS E LOWE | 10/23/2015 | |||||||
Maria L Lowe vs Thomas E Lowe | |||||||||
2015DR01023 | CHARLES EDWARD WILLIS | 10/23/2015 | |||||||
Felicia Denise Willis vs Charles Edward Willis | |||||||||
2015DR00058 | STEPHEN STANOIKOVICH | 10/23/2015 | |||||||
Ronda Stanoikovich vs Stephen Stanoikovich | |||||||||
2015DR00256 | SHAWN M WRIGHT | 10/23/2015 | |||||||
Shelly R Wright vs Shawn M Wright | |||||||||
2014DR01139 | SCOTT J STEFFES | 10/23/2015 | |||||||
Evelyn J Steffes vs Scott J Steffes | |||||||||
2015DR00735 | ASHLEY B VANHORN | 10/23/2015 | |||||||
Jeffrey M Vanhorn vs Ashley B Vanhorn | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1020, 1021, 1022 ... 1345, 1346, 1347 Next |